ND HB1246 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gratis tags for hunting big game; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Gratis tags for hunting big game; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 2 |
2019-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |