ND 1245 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-52.1-04, 54-52.1-04.1, 54-52.1-04.2, and 54-52.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee uniform group insurance plans for health benefits; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee uniform group insurance plans for health benefits; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
2021-04-05SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4
2021-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-11HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback