ND 1244 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 4.1-25-40.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the direct sale of raw milk or raw milk products; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-25-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure for the sale of raw milk or raw milk products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure for the sale of raw milk or raw milk products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 89
2021-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback