ND HB1243 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 47-10-11, 47-19-01, and 47-19-46 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to recording of easements.
Title
Recording of easements.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Jay Fisher [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 80 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |