ND HB1240 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restitution for riot offenses; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Restitution for riot offenses; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 73 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |