ND 1237 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to provide for a task force on prevention of sexual abuse of children; and to provide for a report to the legislative management and the governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL to provide for a task force on prevention of sexual abuse of children; and to provide for a report to the legislative management and the governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2019-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-16SenateSigned by President
2019-04-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2
2019-04-15HouseConcurred
2019-04-02HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-02SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-02SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-18SenateReceived from House
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2019-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback