ND HB1236 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-35-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the chairman and vice chairman of the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The chairman and vice chairman of the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] |
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 68 |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |