ND 1235 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact subsections 4 and 5 to section 54-61-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to confidential records by the commission on legal counsel for indigents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to confidential records by the commission on legal counsel for indigents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-19SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-06SenateConference committee appointed D. Larson Luick Osland
2017-04-05HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Johnston M. Nelson
2017-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-24HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1
2017-03-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
2017-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 3
2017-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:50
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1235.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-01002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0360-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-19.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-53.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-70.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback