ND HB1233 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-52.1-04.16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system prescription drug coverage performance audits.
Title
Public employees retirement system prescription drug coverage performance audits.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider failed |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Requested House to return |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |