ND 1233 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-04-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licenses to carry concealed weapons; to amend and reenact subdivision m of subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possessing a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possessing a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-13SenateSigned by President
2017-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-12HouseConcurred
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback