ND HB1232 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection? 4 of section? 16.1-08.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign contribution reporting requirements for legislative candidates.
Title
Campaign contribution reporting requirements for legislative candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78 |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |