ND 1231 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding the benefits of investing legacy fund moneys locally.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding the benefits of investing legacy fund moneys locally.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-08SenateSigned by President
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
2021-04-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 03:15
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-17SenateReceived from House
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2
2021-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback