ND 1230 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 52-06-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unemployment insurance maximum potential benefits; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment insurance maximum potential benefits; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
2017-01-18HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback