ND 1228 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 59-04.2-03.1 and 59-09-04.1, chapter 59-10.1, section 59-14-05, and chapters 59-16.1, 59-16.2, and 59-16.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to actions to contest the validity of a trust, trust decanting, and directed trustees; to amend and reenact sections 47-02-27.4, 59-04.2-03, and 59-16-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exclusions from the rule against perpetuities and a trustee's duty to inform; to repeal sections 59-14-01, 59-14-04, and 59-16-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the capacity of a settlor of a revocable trust, actions contesting the validity of a trust, and powers to direct a trustee; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The capacity of a settlor of a revocable trust, actions contesting the validity of a trust, and powers to direct a trustee; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Governor 03/21
2017-03-17HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-14SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseReturned to House
2017-03-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
2017-03-09SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 10:25
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback