ND HB1228 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 59-04.2-03.1 and 59-09-04.1, chapter 59-10.1, section 59-14-05, and chapters 59-16.1, 59-16.2, and 59-16.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to actions to contest the validity of a trust, trust decanting, and directed trustees; to amend and reenact sections 47-02-27.4, 59-04.2-03, and 59-16-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exclusions from the rule against perpetuities and a trustee's duty to inform; to repeal sections 59-14-01, 59-14-04, and 59-16-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the capacity of a settlor of a revocable trust, actions contesting the validity of a trust, and powers to direct a trustee; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
The capacity of a settlor of a revocable trust, actions contesting the validity of a trust, and powers to direct a trustee; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2017-03-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:25 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |