ND 1228 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 57-38-01.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the carryforward period for excess geothermal, solar, wind, or biomass energy device income tax credits; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The carryforward period for excess geothermal, solar, wind, or biomass energy device income tax credits; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-06HouseSigned by Governor 04/02
2015-04-01HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-31SenateSigned by President
2015-03-26HouseReturned to House
2015-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2015-03-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2015-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2015-02-23SenateReceived from House
2015-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19
2015-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2015-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback