ND 1227 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
Pending: Joint Political Subdivisions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 47-16-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting residential rental licensure fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting residential rental licensure fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-31SenateReceived from House
2019-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback