ND HB1227 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medicaid fraud; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Medicaid fraud; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 10 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 78 |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 1 4 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |