ND 1226 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a study of establishment of a medicaid fraud control unit and a report to the legislative management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a study of establishment of a medicaid fraud control unit and a report to the legislative management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17HouseSigned by Governor 03/16
2017-03-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-09HouseReturned to House
2017-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 4
2017-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 1 4
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-17HouseRereferred to Human Services
2017-01-17HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback