ND 1223 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 5-01-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for an individual under twenty-one years of age who consumes, purchases, or possesses an alcoholic beverage; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The penalty for an individual under twenty-one years of age who consumes, purchases, or possesses an alcoholic beverage; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-25SenateSigned by President
2021-03-24HouseReturned to House
2021-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4
2021-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11
2021-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback