ND 1222 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 12.1-31-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the process for seeking a sexual assault restraining order; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The process for seeking a sexual assault restraining order; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-04-06HouseConcurred
2017-03-24HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2017-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback