ND 1219 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 23-07-02.3 and 23-07-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reportable conditions and post-mortem communicable diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reportable conditions and post-mortem communicable diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseSigned by Governor 03/29
2021-03-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-24SenateSigned by President
2021-03-23HouseReturned to House
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-19SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6
2021-02-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback