ND 1219 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 39-05-22, section 47-01-03, and subsections 1, 7, and 8 of section 47-10-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the process for converting manufactured housing to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The process for converting manufactured housing to real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-15SenateSigned by President
2017-03-14HouseReturned to House
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-02-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-01-11HouseRereferred to Transportation
2017-01-11HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback