ND 1218 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-08-04.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hunting by nonresidents who own land in North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting by nonresidents who own land in North Dakota.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback