ND HB1218 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 12.1-20-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the offense level for sexual assault; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The offense level for sexual assault; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:50 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |