ND HB1217 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 49-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to competition between the government and private industry and to require a report to the legislative management.
Title
Competition between the government and private industry and to require a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] |
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 24 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67 |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |