ND 1217 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 2-05-11 and 2-05-11.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to aircraft registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aircraft registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-15SenateSigned by President
2017-03-14HouseReturned to House
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2017-03-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8
2017-02-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1
2017-01-20HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-20HouseReported back, do pass 13 0 1
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback