ND 1214 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-32-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to taxes imposed on air carrier transportation companies; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes imposed on air carrier transportation companies; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-26SenateSigned by President
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-23SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2021-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-15HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-01-15HouseRequest return from committee
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback