ND 1214 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-39.4-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the streamlined sales tax governing board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership of the streamlined sales tax governing board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Governor 03/06
2019-03-06HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-04SenateSigned by President
2019-03-01HouseReturned to House
2019-02-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2019-02-27SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-27SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-01-22SenateReceived from House
2019-01-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 9
2019-01-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-14HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback