ND HB1214 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Miller A BILL for an Act to authorize the department of human services to convey certain land in Walsh County, North Dakota.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Miller A BILL for an Act to authorize the department of human services to convey certain land in Walsh County, North Dakota.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1214.html |