ND HB1212 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 11-39-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county fair association membership.
Title
County fair association membership.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Rep. Bill Tveit [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 7 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 85 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |