ND HB1211 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-23-01, 15.1-23-02, 15.1-23-03, 15.1-23-06, 15.1-23-08, and 15.1-23-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education.
Title
Home education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04 | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by Governor 04/04 | |
2011-04-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-29 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-25 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Received from House | |
2011-02-22 | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 19 | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 3 0 | |
2011-02-01 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |