ND HB1207 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 32-46.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to civil actions involving asbestos; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 28-01.3-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability of nonmanufacturing sellers; and to provide for application.
Title
Liability of nonmanufacturing sellers; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15 |
2021-04-14 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 18 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-02-15 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |