ND HB1207 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 20.1-11-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disposition of property abandoned on certain public lands; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The disposition of property abandoned on certain public lands; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |