ND 1206 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-40.6-01, 57-40.6-05, and 57-40.6-06, subsection 3 of section 57-40.6-07, subsections 3 and 4 of section 57-40.6-10, sections 57-40.6-12 and 57-40.6-13, and subdivision c of subsection 8 of section 57-40.6-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency services communication systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services communication systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-15SenateSigned by President
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
2021-04-14HouseConcurred
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5
2021-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2021-02-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback