ND 1206 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 13 of section 14-15-01 and sections 14-15.1-01 and 14-15.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the investigation and report by a child-placing agency and the definition of relative; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The investigation and report by a child-placing agency and the definition of relative; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/04
2017-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-03-31HouseConcurred
2017-03-14HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 3
2017-03-13SenateAmendment adopted
2017-03-13SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2017-03-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
2017-01-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1206.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0566-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-14.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-45.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-59.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback