ND 1204 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-01.5 and subdivision? a of subsection? 1 of section 20.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to youth hunting; and to repeal section 20.1-04-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the protection of bald eagles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The protection of bald eagles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-12SenateSigned by President
2017-04-10SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-07SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 2
2017-04-07HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-05HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed Unruh Kreun Oban
2017-03-31HouseConference committee appointed Roers Jones Heinert Lefor
2017-03-31HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-24HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-23SenateAmendment adopted
2017-03-23SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2017-03-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2
2017-01-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-23HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1204.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-01001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0663-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-18.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-53.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-64.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback