ND HB1202 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15-01-02 and subsection 1 of section 21-10-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to funds managed by the state investment board and the investments of the board of university and school lands.
Title
Funds managed by the state investment board and the investments of the board of university and school lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Bill Tveit [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66 |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |