ND 1201 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Veto sustained, yeas 49 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 47-16-13.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to landlord responsibilities regarding carbon monoxide detection devices; to amend and reenact section 23-13-15 and subsection 4 of section 54-21.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the installation of carbon monoxide and smoke detection alarms; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The installation of carbon monoxide and smoke detection alarms; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House Veto sustained, (Y: 49 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Veto sustained, (Y: 49 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseVeto sustained, yeas 49 nays 39
2017-04-26HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2017-04-26HouseVetoed by Governor
2017-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-24SenateSigned by President
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 24 nays 19
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 29
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report rejected
2017-04-17HouseRequest return from committee
2017-04-13HouseRereferred to conference committee
2017-04-13HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-05SenateConference committee appointed Casper Roers Marcellais
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed Sukut Lefor Boschee
2017-04-04HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5
2017-04-03SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-29SenateRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 1
2017-03-21SenateRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2017-03-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 37
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1201.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-03008a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-07000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-08000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0343-09000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback