ND 1200 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on property tax levied by taxing districts without voter approval; to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 4 of section 15.1-27-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the calculation of school district state aid payments; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The calculation of school district state aid payments; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
2021-01-20HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback