ND HB1200 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 54-11.1 and a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of a state-facilitated retirement program for the private sector; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Creation of a state-facilitated retirement program for the private sector; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Philip Murphy [D] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 73 |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 3 3 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |