ND 1199 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-28-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disposition of proceeds from tax lien foreclosures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The disposition of proceeds from tax lien foreclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-04-15SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-15SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-04-14HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-08SenateConference committee appointed Weber Patten Piepkorn
2021-04-07HouseConference committee appointed B. Koppelman Steiner Ista
2021-04-07HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-04-05SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-01SenateReceived from House
2021-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2021-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 3
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1199.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-03002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-03004a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0528-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-17.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback