ND 1199 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to platoons; to amend and reenact section 39-10-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to following a motor vehicle too closely; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Following a motor vehicle too closely; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 2
2019-04-01HouseConcurred
2019-03-26HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 3
2019-03-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2019-01-30SenateReceived from House
2019-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback