ND 1199 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 5 to section 61-33-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of subsurface minerals; and to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 61-33-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of sovereign lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of sovereign lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 42
2017-04-18SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
2017-02-15HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 1 3
2017-02-07HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-07HouseAmendment adopted
2017-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback