ND HB1199 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 57-15-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to referral of a city, county, or park district property tax levy; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Referral of a city, county, or park district property tax levy; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 49 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |