ND 1198 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the governor's authority regarding polling places during a declared state of disaster or emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The governor's authority regarding polling places during a declared state of disaster or emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 24
2021-03-22SenateReconsidered
2021-03-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 20
2021-03-18SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-17SenateReceived from House
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 17
2021-02-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback