ND HB1198 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-10-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to class A authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Class A authorized emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |