ND 1198 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 26.1-39-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property and casualty insurance binders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property and casualty insurance binders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-13HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-10SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-09SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-01-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback