ND 1197 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to asbestos bankruptcy trust transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asbestos bankruptcy trust transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 7
2017-04-05HouseConcurred
2017-03-09HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
2017-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback