ND HB1195 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 51-07-30 and chapter 51-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to customer contract clauses and the use of certain marketing practices involving automatic renewal; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Title
Customer contract clauses and the use of certain marketing practices involving automatic renewal; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |